Armstead v. Farmers Insurance Company Inc
Plaintiff: Broderic Armstead
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00458
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Farmers Insurance Company Inc. (Talley, Graham)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File a reply brief. Defendant may file his reply brief within five (5) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/19. (amr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Farmers Insurance Company Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Talley, Graham)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steadman, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jerry D. Garner terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/31/19. (amr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jerry Garner by Broderic Armstead (Holleman, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Farmers Insurance Company Inc. (Talley, Graham)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Farmers Insurance Company Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Talley, Graham)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to 11 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: This case is substantially similar to a case pending before the Honorable James M. Moody, Jr. --DuPriest, et al v. Allstate Insurance Company, 4:19-CV-00230-JM. Accordingly, based on General Order 29(b)(5) and for judicial efficiency, the Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to Judge Moody. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 07/11/19. (dmm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/9/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/23/2019. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 7/1/19. (mmb)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendant's answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Friday, July 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 07/01/19. (dmm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #7 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/1/2019. (jbh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Farmers Insurance Company Inc (Talley, Graham)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Graham Caughman Talley on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company Inc. (jbh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company Inc. (jbh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Farmers Insurance Company Inc. (jbh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Farmers Insurance Company Inc filed by Broderic Armstead. (jbh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Farmers Insurance Company Inc from Saline County Circuit Court, case number 63CV-19-631-3. (Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT072797) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstead v. Farmers Insurance Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broderic Armstead
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Represented By: Jerry D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company Inc
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Represented By: Graham Caughman Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?