Boyd v. Doe
Plaintiff: Thomas Waylon Boyd
Defendant: Doe
Case Number: 4:2019cv00461
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #4 Recommended Disposition by Thomas Waylon Boyd. (ljb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Thomas Waylon Boyd. (llg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Boyd's lawsuit be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; and that this dismissal should count as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/15/2019. (ljb)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be collected from plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Bowie County Correctional Center and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/12/2019. (kdr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Doe filed by Thomas Waylon Boyd. (ljb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Waylon Boyd. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Waylon Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?