Bower v. Jones
Plaintiff: Michael Bower
Defendant: Ferman Jones
Case Number: 4:2019cv00468
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ferman Jones.(Hasty, Danielle)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bower. Ferman Jones served on 7/3/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. (jak)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/2/2019. (jbh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against Ferman Jones, filed by Michael Bower. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072855.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bower v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bower
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Tess Elizabeth Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferman Jones
Represented By: Danielle K. Hasty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?