Richardson v. Higginson, City of et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Richardson
Defendant: Patricia Homesly, David Parrish, Randell Homesly, Danny Yoder, Dennis Ussery, Larry Glover, Higginson, City of and Susan Bolton
Case Number: 4:2019cv00469
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/21/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/4/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 08/20/2019. (tmw)
July 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include a reference to the Jury Demand. (thd)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (jbh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jacqueline Richardson. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 7/5/2019 to include a reference to the Jury Demand.) (thd).
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint by All Defendants.(jbh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by All Defendants. (jbh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jacqueline Richardson. (jbh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from White County Circuit Court, case number 73CV-18-110. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt number LIT072859. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Higginson, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Richardson
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Homesly
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Parrish
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randell Homesly
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Yoder
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Ussery
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Glover
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higginson, City of
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Bolton
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?