Lewis v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Charles H Lewis, Jr
Defendant: Franklin Credit Management Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00470
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Response. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description and linkage of the document filed as "REPLY BRIEF in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Franklin Credit Management Corporation" as marked on the document. (jak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Franklin Credit Management Corporation. (Lieber, Robert) (Docket text modified on 8/14/2019 to correct the description and linkage of the document filed) (jak)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time (Amend) filed by Charles H Lewis, Jr. (Ogles, Johnson)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time (Amend) by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lieber, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lieber, Robert)
August 2, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Response in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "REPLY BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Franklin Credit Management Corporation" as marked on the document. (jak)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Franklin Credit Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lieber, Robert) (Docket text modified on 8/2/2019 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ogles, Johnson)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the proposed order was filed as an attachment to docket entry #7 in error.(jak)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Franklin Credit Management Corporation. (Lieber, Robert)(Docket text modified on 7/16/2019 to remove reference to the proposed order) (jak)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Lieber, Jr on behalf of Franklin Credit Management Corporation (Lieber, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER removing the hearing set for Monday, 7/8/2019, beginning at 1:30 p.m., from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/8/2019. (jbh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing on plaintiff Charles H. Lewis, Jr.'s pending request for temporary restraining order. Hearing set for Monday, 7/8/2019 at 01:30 PM in Little Rock Courtroom #4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. (jbh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Franklin Credit Management Corporation. (jbh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTION, QUIET TITLE, FRAUD AND DAMAGES with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Charles H Lewis, Jr. (jbh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Franklin Credit Management Corporation from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-4472. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt number LIT072862. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles H Lewis, Jr
Represented By: Johnson D. Ogles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Credit Management Corporation
Represented By: Teaven Stamatis
Represented By: Robert T. Lieber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Robert T. Lieber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?