Beasley v. Macuils Tire And Service Center LLC et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Beasley
Defendant: Macuils Tire And Service Center LLC and Sergio Macuil
Case Number: 4:2019cv00471
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Antonio Beasley. (Sanford, Joshua)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Schnuerle, Angela)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants (Schnuerle, Angela)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Schnuerle on behalf of All Defendants (Schnuerle, Angela)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonio Beasley. Sergio Macuil served on 8/5/2019; Macuils Tire And Service Center LLC served on 8/5/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants filed by Antonio Beasley. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072877.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Macuils Tire And Service Center LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macuils Tire And Service Center LLC
Represented By: Angela Schnuerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Macuil
Represented By: Angela Schnuerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Beasley
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Sean Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?