Marshall v. Transamerica Corp et al
Plaintiff: Breanna Marshall
Defendant: Transamerica Corp and Tata Consultancy Services Ltd
Case Number: 4:2019cv00472
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/31/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/14/2019. Proposed Bench Trial set sometime during the week of 7/22/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Transamerica Corp (Washko, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Transamerica Corp.(Washko, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Washko on behalf of Transamerica Corp (Washko, Elizabeth)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Breanna Marshall. Transamerica Corp served on 8/1/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants filed by Breanna Marshall. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072877.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Transamerica Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna Marshall
Represented By: Stacy Gibson
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Corp
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Washko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tata Consultancy Services Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?