Coates v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Victor Coates
Defendant: Kerry Baldwin Jucas Moody, Kelly Boyd, John Thurston, Kerry Kerry Jucas Moody, Mark Martin, Kerry Jucas, Kerry Baldwin, Judith Crouch, Susan Carter and Ben Ellis
Case Number: 4:2019cv00476
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #13 Notice of Appearance, #14 Answer to Complaint lack a correct case number (Local Rule 5.5(a)). (jak)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/12/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/26/2019. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 8/31/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kelly Boyd, Susan Carter, Judith Crouch, Ben Ellis, Mark Martin, Kerry Baldwin Jucas Moody, John Thurston.(Sullivan, Gary) Additional attachment added on 9/4/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L. Sullivan on behalf of All Defendants (Sullivan, Gary) Additional attachment added on 9/4/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Kelly Boyd served on 8/12/2019. (fjg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Susan Carter served on 8/12/2019. (fjg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Judith Crouch served on 8/14/2019. (fjg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Ben Ellis served on 8/12/2019. (fjg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Kerry Baldwin Jucas Moody served on 8/12/2019. (fjg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. John Thurston served on 8/12/2019. (fjg)
August 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare Summonses and the Marshal to serve the Summons and Complaint on Defendants in this action without prepayment of costs. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/5/2019. (ljb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #4 Order filed by Victor Coates. (fjg)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for leave to proceed IFP. Plaintiff is directed to file the mailing addresses of the Defendants on or before 7/26/2019. If Plaintiff fails to provide the address and fails to seek an extension, the Complaint may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/17/2019. (jak)(Docket text modified on 7/18/2019 to correct a typographical error)(jak)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/8/2019. (ljb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Victor Coates. (ljb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Victor Coates. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coates v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Baldwin Jucas Moody
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Boyd
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Kerry Jucas Moody
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Martin
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Jucas
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Baldwin
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Crouch
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Carter
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Ellis
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?