Hampton v. HealthSCOPE Benefits Inc
Plaintiff: Crystal Hampton
Defendant: HealthSCOPE Benefits Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00489
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by HealthSCOPE Benefits Inc (Magnus, Eric)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/28/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/12/2019. Bench Trial set for 8/18/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson.Entered at the direction of the Court on 8/23/19. (mmb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda J. Fray on behalf of HealthSCOPE Benefits Inc (Fray, Amanda)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HealthSCOPE Benefits Inc.(Magnus, Eric)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Hampton. HealthSCOPE Benefits Inc served on 8/1/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Hampton. HealthSCOPE Benefits Inc served on 7/15/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/15/2019. (ljb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against HealthSCOPE Benefits Inc, filed by Crystal Hampton. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073018.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. HealthSCOPE Benefits Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthSCOPE Benefits Inc
Represented By: Eric R. Magnus
Represented By: Amanda J. Fray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Hampton
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Tess Elizabeth Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?