Duckworth v. Brasuell et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery Duckworth
Defendant: J Brent Standridge, Toney Brasuell, Mike Robinson and Jonathan Camp
Case Number: 4:2019cv00492
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #6 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. This dismissal counts as a "strike" and the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/13/2019. (ljb)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this order to the Administrator of the Saline County Detention Center; dismissing without prejudice Duckworth's #1 Complaint and claims for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; counting this dismissal as a "strike"; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from this Order and accompanying Judgment is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/13/2019. (ljb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffery Duckworth. (ljb)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing Duckworth to either pay the $400 filing and administrative fee or file a complete IFP application within 30 days from the date of this Order to proceed with this case; and directing the Clerk to send Duckworth an IFP application. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/22/2019. (ljb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffery Duckworth. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS that you must pay the $400 filing fee or file an IFP motion within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Mr. Duckworth an IFP application, along with a prison calculation sheet. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/15/2019. (ljb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeffery Duckworth.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duckworth v. Brasuell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Brent Standridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toney Brasuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?