Corley v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marian Corley
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00498
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/21/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/4/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 08/20/2019. (tmw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original civil cover sheet was not submitted with the #1 Notice of Removal. The cover sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties.(cmn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed by Marian Corley. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Saline County Circuit Court, Case Number 63CV-19-786. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073034. (ljb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corley v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Corley
Represented By: Carter C. Stein
Represented By: Sarah Coppola Jewell
Represented By: Will Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?