Cheatham v. Diversified Consultants Inc
Plaintiff: Brenda Cheatham
Defendant: Diversified Consultants Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00516
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 the Joint Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, this CASE is DISMISSED with prejudice, subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. This Court specifically retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 08/26/19. (dmm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Diversified Consultants Inc. (McPherson, Keith)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Diversified Consultants Inc (McPherson, Keith)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Diversified Consultants Inc (McPherson, Keith)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Diversified Consultants Inc.(McPherson, Keith)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original civil cover sheet was submitted in error (lack of conventional signature). The correct document was added to docket entry #1 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/30/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/15/2019. Bench Trial set for 7/21/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 7/23/19. (mmb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Diversified Consultants Inc filed by Brenda Cheatham. (ljb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diversified Consultants Inc from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number PBSH-2019-52. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073122. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheatham v. Diversified Consultants Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Consultants Inc
Represented By: Keith Martin McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?