Linden v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Cody Linden
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00545
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Cody Linden. Social Security Administration served on 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit USPS Green Card, #2 Affidavit USPS Green Card, #3 Affidavit USPS Green Card)(McKinnon, Laura)
August 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to Plaintiff's attorney for service. (jbh)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/12/19. (kam)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #2 Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Cody Linden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #2 Main Document - Correct (submitted 8/9/2019)) (cmn).
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cody Linden. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linden v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Linden
Represented By: Laura J. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?