Davis v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Elise Davis
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00548
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Ray
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to #6 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Social Security Administration served on 8/19/2019. (kdr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 8/19/2019. (kdr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Social Security Administration served on 8/19/2019. (kdr) Additional attachment added on 8/30/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/20/19. (tjb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Elise Davis. (llg)
August 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jbh)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing the Clerk to file and docket the Complaint, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor, and issue summons for Defendant, the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Arkansas, and the United States Attorney General; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, Complaint, and this Order without prepayment of fees and costs or the necessity of giving security. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/12/2019. (jbh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Elise Davis. (jbh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elise Davis. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?