Smith v. Strode
Plaintiff: Wynona D Smith
Defendant: Natalie Strode
Case Number: 4:2019cv00557
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Official Capacity Claims by Natalie Strode (Windle, Nicholas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Rudolph Windle on behalf of Natalie Strode (Windle, Nicholas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 ADDENDUM filed by Wynona D Smith. (fjg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Chan Jung on behalf of Natalie Strode (Jung, David)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Natalie Strode. (Jung, David)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Natalie Strode (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 6, 2011 Order, #2 Exhibit B - May 11, 2017 Order, #3 Exhibit C - August 23, 2017 Order, #4 Exhibit D - February 15, 2019 Petition, #5 Exhibit E - February 20, 2019 Waiver, #6 Exhibit F - February 20, 2019 Order, #7 Exhibit G - August 14, 2019 Order)(Jung, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDMENT filed by Wynona D Smith. (fjg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST a Claim for Relief against Natalie Strode filed by Wynona D Smith.(fjg)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing plaintiff Wynona Smith to show that subject matter jurisdiction exists. She is given 21 days to amend her complaint to make this showing. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/19/2019. (kdr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Natalie Strode, filed by Wynona D Smith. (jbh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wynona D Smith. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Strode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynona D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Strode
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Represented By: David Chan Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?