Haynes v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Stacey Lee Haynes
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00558
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Joe J Volpe
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Tucker on behalf of Social Security Administration (Tucker, Eric)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/27/2019. (ljb)
August 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (ljb)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting permission to proceed in forma pauperis #1 . The Clerk will issue summons without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/13/2019. (lej)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was not submitted during docketing due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The Civil Cover Sheet has been added to #2 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Stacey Lee Haynes. (jbh) Additional attachment added on 8/12/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet. (kbc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stacey Lee Haynes. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Lee Haynes
Represented By: Iva Nell Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Eric B. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?