Stickford v. Marable Transports Inc et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Stickford
Defendant: James Daniel, Marable Transports Inc and Chad Daniel James
Case Number: 4:2019cv00568
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spinks, Hugh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Blair, Pamela)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Chad Daniel James.(Blair, Pamela)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Warnock Blair on behalf of All Defendants (Blair, Pamela)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Myers Attorneys' Service, filed by Daniel Stickford. Chad Daniel James served on 9/4/2019. (Spinks, Hugh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Marable Transports Inc.(Blair, Pamela)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spinks, Hugh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs (Spinks, Hugh)
September 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to Chad Daniel James and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Daniel Stickford(Spinks, Hugh)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff seeks to amend his complaint to correct the name of a defendant, and the motion is unopposed. Plaintiff is directed to file the amended/corrected pleading within five (5) days from this entry. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 08/29/2019. (jjb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint filed by Marable Transports Inc. (Blair, Pamela)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Spinks, Hugh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/24/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/7/2019; and Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/16/2019. (hml)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (incomplete image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (thd)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Marable Transports Inc.(Blair, Pamela)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Daniel Stickford. (jbh)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marable Transports Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-4915. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT073482. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2019: #2 Main Document - Correct) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stickford v. Marable Transports Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marable Transports Inc
Represented By: Pamela Warnock Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Daniel James
Represented By: Pamela Warnock Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Stickford
Represented By: Hugh F. Spinks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?