Dorado v. St Vincent Community Health Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Dorado
Defendant: St Vincent Community Health Services Inc, First Initiatives Insurance Ltd, Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Services LLC and St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2019cv00573
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #7 , granted. Mr. Jeffrey P. Leonard is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/24/2019. (slb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey P. Leonard. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3541254. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Scott, Timothy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by St Vincent Community Health Services Inc (Berger, William)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center (Berger, William)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Eric Berger on behalf of Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Services LLC, St Vincent Community Health Services Inc, St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center (Berger, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Services LLC, St Vincent Community Health Services Inc, St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center.(Marts, Gary)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Nicholas Dorado.(kdr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Services LLC, St Vincent Community Health Services Inc, and St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-4891. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073486. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorado v. St Vincent Community Health Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Vincent Community Health Services Inc
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: William Eric Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Initiatives Insurance Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Services LLC
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: William Eric Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: William Eric Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Dorado
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Leonard
Represented By: W. Lewis Garrison, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Scott
Represented By: Callis L. Childs
Represented By: Sach D. Oliver
Represented By: Frank H. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?