Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Clevenger et al
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Estate of Margaret Clevenger, Matthew Timothy Clevenger, Timothy Clevenger, Emily Clevenger Pierce, Maureen Durkin and Katherine Clevenger
Case Number: 4:2019cv00574
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party served as Emily Clevenger Pierce as marked on the document.(jak)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Civil Cov Sheet, Complaint, Summons, Notice, Consent & Reference of Civil Action to Magistrate Judge, Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Emily Clevenger Pierce served on 9/14/2019. (Bingham, M.)(Docket text modified on 9/24/2019 to correct the party served) (jak)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Summons, Notice Consent and Reference of Civil Action to Magistrate Judge, Corporate Disclosures , filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Maureen Durkin served on 9/12/2019. (Bingham, M.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge, Corporate Disclosure Statement , filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Timothy Clevenger served on 8/29/2019. (Bingham, M.)
August 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to Katherine Clevenger, Matthew Timothy Clevenger, Timothy Clevenger, Maureen Durkin, Emily Clevenger Pierce and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial Inc for Prudential Insurance Company of America. (kdr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073499. Summons not issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Clevenger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Margaret Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Timothy Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Clevenger Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: M. Stephen Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?