Ellis v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Brent Ellis
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00583
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/18/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/2/2019; and Jury Trial set for 9/21/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/10/2019. (hml)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Tucker, Scott)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher Bruce Knox on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Knox, Kristopher)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Tucker on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Tucker, Scott)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Brent Ellis. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wolff, Nelson)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Brent Ellis Election for Case to Remain with United States District Judge (Wolff, Nelson)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company, filed by Brent Ellis. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073528.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Kristopher Bruce Knox
Represented By: Scott H. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Ellis
Represented By: Nelson Gregory Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?