Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company v. Clinton William Holland Revocable Trust UAD August 9, 2010 et al
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company
Defendant: Allison Holland, Clinton William Holland, Kalob Franke and Clinton William Holland Revocable Trust UAD August 9, 2010
Case Number: 4:2019cv00586
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company (Franks, Adam)
October 14, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kalob Franke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC v. George, et al. Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2, Hagan deposition, #3 Exhibit 3, Holland deposition, #4 Exhibit 4, Franke deposition, #5 Exhibit 5, Franke Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 6, Police Report)(Lacy, Brandon)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #16 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply. Accordingly, Defendant's reply must be filed by 5 p.m., Monday, October 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/03/19. (dmm)
October 3, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 14 Text Entry Only Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to #13 Stipulation pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File by Kalob Franke (Lacy, Brandon)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. (Franks, Adam)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 the Stipulation of Dismissal. Accordingly, Defendant Allison Holland is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 09/24/19. (dmm) (Docket text modified on 10/3/2019 to correct the linkage) (jak)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice-Partial as to Allison Holland only by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. (Franks, Adam)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons to Kalob Franke, filed by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. Kalob Franke served on 9/5/2019. (Franks, Adam)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons to Allison Holland, filed by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. Allison Holland served on 9/5/2019. (Franks, Adam)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons to Clinton Holland, filed by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. Clinton William Holland served on 9/12/2019. (Franks, Adam)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons to Holland Trust, filed by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. Clinton William Holland Revocable Trust UAD August 9, 2010 served on 9/12/2019. (Franks, Adam)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Anne Henry on behalf of Kalob Franke (Henry, Megan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon W. Lacy on behalf of Kalob Franke (Lacy, Brandon)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Clinton William Holland Revocable Trust UAD August 9, 2010, Clinton William Holland.(Fuqua, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kalob Franke. (Lacy, Brandon)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kalob Franke (Lacy, Brandon)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/29/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/12/2019. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 9/20/19. (mmb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Fuqua on behalf of Clinton William Holland Revocable Trust UAD August 9, 2010, Allison Holland, Clinton William Holland (Fuqua, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073542.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company v. Clinton William Holland Revocable Trust UAD August 9, 2010 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Michael Strauss
Represented By: Adam D. Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Holland
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton William Holland
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalob Franke
Represented By: Megan Anne Henry
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton William Holland Revocable Trust UAD August 9, 2010
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?