Gilliam v. Staley et al
Plaintiff: Richard Gilliam
Defendant: John Staley, Robert Lanius, Margie Grigsby and Matthew Hodge
Case Number: 4:2019cv00593
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Richard Gilliam. (ljb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION by Richard Gilliam. (kdr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: Based on #4 order filed today, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/8/2019. (ljb)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), failure to respond to court orders, and for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/8/2019. (ljb)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Lonoke County Sheriff; directing the Clerk to send a blank 1983 complaint form to Gilliam; and directing Gilliam to file an amended complaint conforming to this order within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/3/2019. (ljb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard Gilliam. (llg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Gilliam. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliam v. Staley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lanius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margie Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?