Williams v. JEI Trucking LLC et al
Plaintiff: Justin Williams
Defendant: Starr Oilfield Services LLC, JEI Trucking LLC and Steven Nason
Case Number: 4:2019cv00606
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice as moot #5 Motion. #7 Motion to transfer will hang fire. JEI Trucking and Nason must respond to the joint motion when they answer. Williams must serve the motion on them when he serves them with the summons and complaint, or now, if process has already been served. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/2019. (jak)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case by Justin Williams (Sanford, Joshua)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Request to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.1404(a) filed by Starr Oilfield Services LLC. (Downing, Richard)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Request to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.1404(a) by Starr Oilfield Services LLC (Downing, Richard)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER granting Starr Oilfield Services LLC a 10 day extension to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/25/2019. (jak)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Downing on behalf of Starr Oilfield Services LLC (Downing, Richard)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Williams. Starr Oilfield Services LLC served on 9/5/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Justin Williams. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073670. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. JEI Trucking LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Williams
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Oilfield Services LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEI Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Nason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?