Musticchi v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Joseph Musticchi
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc and Wright Medical Group Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00607
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/29/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/13/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 09/30/2019. (tmw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (editable image file format). The correct document was added to docket entry #7 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Scott Kramer on behalf of All Defendants (Kramer, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 9/30/2019)) (jak).
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal /Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Wright Medical Group, Inc. by Wright Medical Technology Inc. (Irby, Scott)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney Nicholas M. Centrella. Mr. Centrella shall appear as counsel for defendants. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/24/2019. (jbh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand /Answer of Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. to Plaintiff's Complaint by Wright Medical Technology Inc.(Irby, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Nicholas M. Centrella, Jr.. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3543384. Filed by Wright Medical Technology Inc (Irby, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Andrew Irby on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Irby, Scott)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Joseph Musticchi. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073689.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musticchi v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Joseph Musticchi
Represented By: Paul J. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: Nicholas M. Centrella, Jr
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Represented By: J. Scott Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group Inc
Represented By: Nicholas M. Centrella, Jr
Represented By: J. Scott Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?