Brown et al v. Trinity Properties LLC
Plaintiff: Don Harris, Timothy Green, Ashley Moore, Denise Scott, Tara Crow, Mario Foy and David Brown
Defendant: Trinity Properties LLC, Tri 5 Jacksonville LLC, Andmark Chapel Ridge of Conway LLC and Trinity Property Management LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00617
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join--Titos Williams (Rheaume, April)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join--Richard Burton (Rheaume, April)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan L. Mendenhall on behalf of Andmark Chapel Ridge of Conway LLC, Tri 5 Jacksonville LLC, Trinity Property Management LLC (Mendenhall, Nathan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Robinson on behalf of Andmark Chapel Ridge of Conway LLC, Tri 5 Jacksonville LLC, Trinity Property Management LLC (Robinson, Jon)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/3/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/17/2020. Proposed Bench Trial set sometime during the week of 10/19/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by David Brown, Tara Crow, Mario Foy, Timothy Green, Don Harris, Ashley Moore, Denise Scott Consent to Join--Delfred McLennan (Rheaume, April)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, by Andmark Chapel Ridge of Conway LLC, Tri 5 Jacksonville LLC, Trinity Properties LLC, Trinity Property Management LLC.(Brockett, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Brockett on behalf of All Defendants (Brockett, Christopher)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Green, Ashley Moore, Mario Foy, Don Harris, David Brown, Denise Scott, Tara Crow. Andmark Chapel Ridge of Conway LLC served on 9/23/2019; Tri 5 Jacksonville LLC served on 9/23/2019; Trinity Property Management LLC served on 9/23/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against Trinity Property Management LLC, Tri 5 Jacksonville LLC, Andmark Chapel Ridge of Conway LLC filed by David Brown, Tara Crow, Mario Foy, Denise Scott, Don Harris, Ashley Moore, Timothy Green. Summons issued for Trinity Property Management LLC, Tri 5 Jacksonville LLC, Andmark Chapel Ridge of Conway LLC and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against Trinity Properties LLC, filed by All Plaintiffs. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073750.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Trinity Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Properties LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Brockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri 5 Jacksonville LLC
Represented By: Nathan L. Mendenhall
Represented By: Christopher D. Brockett
Represented By: Jon P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andmark Chapel Ridge of Conway LLC
Represented By: Nathan L. Mendenhall
Represented By: Christopher D. Brockett
Represented By: Jon P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Property Management LLC
Represented By: Nathan L. Mendenhall
Represented By: Christopher D. Brockett
Represented By: Jon P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Harris
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Green
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Moore
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Scott
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Crow
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Foy
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brown
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?