Gray et al v. Shoe Show Inc
Plaintiff: Kquaniea Ezell, Kawanna Gray and Natasha Davies
Defendant: Shoe Show Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00627
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Magnus on behalf of Shoe Show Inc (Magnus, Eric)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/9/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/23/2019. Bench Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 10/1/19. (mmb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Shoe Show Inc (Barnes, Justin)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Shoe Show Inc.(Barnes, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shoe Show Inc, filed by Kawanna Gray, Natasha Davies, Kquaniea Ezell(Sanford, Joshua)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION against Shoe Show Inc filed by All Plaintiffs. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073811.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray et al v. Shoe Show Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoe Show Inc
Represented By: Justin R. Barnes
Represented By: Eric R. Magnus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kquaniea Ezell
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawanna Gray
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Davies
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?