Willis v. DJ's Tire Service LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Willis
Defendant: David Stracner and DJ's Tire Service LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00641
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/3/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/17/2020. Bench Trial set sometime during the week of 10/5/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by David Willis. (Sanford, Joshua)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by David Willis (Sanford, Joshua)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and COUNTER CLAIM against David Willis filed by David Stracner, DJ's Tire Service LLC.(fjg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by David Willis. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073952.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. DJ's Tire Service LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stracner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJ's Tire Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Willis
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?