Bopp et al v. Servicelink Field Services LLC
Plaintiff: Cynthia Bopp and Christopher Bopp
Defendant: Servicelink Field Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00673
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory T. Brewer on behalf of Servicelink Field Services LLC (Brewer, Gregory)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Serbousek Gilbert on behalf of Servicelink Field Services LLC (Gilbert, Tiffany)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/11/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/27/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/09/2019. (rmg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand /Answer to Complaint by Servicelink Field Services LLC.(Young, Regina)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Servicelink Field Services LLC, filed by Christopher Bopp and Cynthia Bopp.(kdr)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Servicelink Field Services LLC from Lonoke County Circuit Court, Case Number 43CV-19-608. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT074079. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bopp et al v. Servicelink Field Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Bopp
Represented By: Floyd A. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bopp
Represented By: Floyd A. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servicelink Field Services LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Regina Ann Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?