Safadi v. Uniti Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ibrahim E Safadi
Defendant: Mark A Wallace, Uniti Group Inc and Kenneth A Gunderman
Case Number: 4:2019cv00756
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edmund Polubinski III; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian M. Burnovski; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nikolaus Williams. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/21/2019. (rmg)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Uniti Group Inc (Askew, Jess)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Motion for Service of Process and Scheduled Under the PLSRA by Kenneth A Gunderman, Uniti Group Inc, Mark A Wallace. (Askew, Jess)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 , #6 , and #7 Notices of Appearance. CORRECTION: The original documents were submitted in error to docket entries #5 , #6 , & #7 . The correct documents were added to docket entries #5 , #6 , and #7 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Nikolaus Williams. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3584079. Filed by All Defendants (Askew, Jess)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Brian M. Burnovski. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3584067. Filed by All Defendants (Askew, Jess)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Edmund Polubinski III. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3584061. Filed by All Defendants (Askew, Jess)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Hart Davis on behalf of All Defendants (Davis, Frederick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 11/20/2019)) (jak).
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew King on behalf of All Defendants (King, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 11/20/2019)) (jak).
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jess L. Askew, III on behalf of Kenneth A Gunderman, Uniti Group Inc, Mark A Wallace (Askew, Jess) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 11/20/2019)) (jak).
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory M. Nespole. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/14/2019. (rmg)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Ibrahim E Safadi. Uniti Group Inc served on 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pulliam, Randall)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Gregory M. Nespole. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3577918. Filed by Ibrahim E Safadi (Pulliam, Randall)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Ibrahim E Safadi. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT074488. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safadi v. Uniti Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Wallace
Represented By: Nikolaus Williams
Represented By: Brian M. Burnovski
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Frederick Hart Davis
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniti Group Inc
Represented By: Nikolaus Williams
Represented By: Brian M. Burnovski
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Frederick Hart Davis
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth A Gunderman
Represented By: Nikolaus Williams
Represented By: Brian M. Burnovski
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Frederick Hart Davis
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibrahim E Safadi
Represented By: Gregory M. Nespole
Represented By: Randall Keith Pulliam
Represented By: Eduard Korsinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?