Stalcup v. Paramount Recovery Systems LP
Plaintiff: Sherry Stalcup
Defendant: Paramount Recovery Systems LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00759
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Paramount Recovery Systems LP answer due on or before 1/3/2020. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/13/2019. (pgt)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Paramount Recovery Systems LP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maurice, Donald)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald S. Maurice, Jr on behalf of Paramount Recovery Systems LP (Maurice, Donald)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to instructions from the Court, this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/18/2019. (jak)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Paul Smith on behalf of Sherry Stalcup. (jbh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Paramount Recovery Systems LP, filed by Sherry Stalcup. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT074516.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stalcup v. Paramount Recovery Systems LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Stalcup
Represented By: Larry Paul Smith
Represented By: David M. Marco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Recovery Systems LP
Represented By: Donald S. Maurice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?