Arkansas Labeling Inc v. Proctor et al
Plaintiff: Arkansas Labeling Inc
Defendant: Tim Proctor and Label Edge LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00773
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor Witness and Exhibit List (Price, Joseph)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #11 defendants' motion to continue the hearing on Arkansas Labeling's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction; directing the hearing begin at 9:30 a.m. on Friday, 1/10/2020 in Little Rock Courtroom 4C; directing the parties file supplemental briefings following the hearing by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 1/17/2020; directing the parties exchange exhibits that they intend to present and written lists of witnesses that they will or may call at the temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction hearing by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, 12/30/2019; and directing the parties to submit rebuttal exhibits and written lists of rebuttal witnesses by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, 1/6/2020. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/17/2019. (jbh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim CLAIMS VII and VIII of Arkansas Labeling, Inc.'s Complaint filed by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor. (Price, Joseph)
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM CLAIMS VII and VIII of Arkansas Labeling, Inc.'s Complaint by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor (Price, Joseph)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor.(Price, Joseph)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Simpson, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Autumn Powell on behalf of Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor (Powell, Meredith)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor Witness and Exhibit List (Price, Joseph)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Label Edge LLC, Tim Proctor (Price, Joseph)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting hearing on #3 motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction on Friday, 12/20/2019, beginning at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom 4C; directing parties to file supplemental briefings by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 12/27/2019; directing the parties to exchange exhibits that they intend to present and written lists of witnesses that they will or may call at the temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction hearing by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 12/13/2019; directing the parties to present rebuttal exhibits or written lists of such rebuttal witnesses by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 12/17/2019; and directing the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of this Order on defendants at the address listed in the affidavits of service. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/3/2019. (jbh)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Order , filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. Tim Proctor served on 11/25/2019. (Simpson, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Order , filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. Label Edge LLC served on 11/25/2019. (Simpson, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Kristine G. Baker: MOTION HEARING held on 11/6/2019 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. After arguments from counsel and witness testimony, the Court took the matter under advisement. (Present for plaintiff: James Simpson and Kyle Kennedy) (Court Reporter Elaine Hinson) (tmw)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order denying #1 Arkansas Labeling's motion for leave to file under seal; directing the Clerk to lift the seal in this case as to all filings made by Arkansas Labeling prior to the date of this Order; and ordering Arkansas labeling to provide notice of its request for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction to defendants. A hearing will be set by the Court by separate Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/6/2019. (thd)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER scheduling an ex parte hearing on the motions on 11/6/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4C in Little Rock. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/04/2019. (ajt) (Document unsealed on 11/6/2019 based on #6 Order and pursuant to instructions from Chambers.) (thd).
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support of #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. (ljb) (Document unsealed on 11/7/2019 per #6 Order.) (thd).
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. (ljb) (Document unsealed on 11/7/2019 per #6 Order.) (thd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Arkansas Labeling Inc. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT074604.) (ljb) (Document unsealed on 11/7/2019 per #6 Order.)(thd).
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Arkansas Labeling Inc. (ljb) (Document unsealed on 11/7/2019 per #6 Order.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas Labeling Inc v. Proctor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Labeling Inc
Represented By: Kyle Kennedy
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Proctor
Represented By: Meredith Autumn Powell
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Label Edge LLC
Represented By: Meredith Autumn Powell
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?