Kilcrease-Tiger v. Welspun Pipes Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mark Kilcrease-Tiger
Defendant: Welspun Pipes Inc, Welspun USA Inc and Welspun Tubular LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00798
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/21/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/23/2019. (slb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Welspun Pipes Inc, Welspun Tubular LLC, Welspun USA Inc.(Northen, Gregory)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory James Northen on behalf of All Defendants (Northen, Gregory)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa McJunkins Duke on behalf of All Defendants (Duke, Melissa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Kilcrease-Tiger. Welspun USA Inc served on 11/15/2019. (Koile, Allison)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Kilcrease-Tiger. Welspun Pipes Inc served on 11/15/2019. (Koile, Allison)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mark Kilcrease-Tiger against All Defendants. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT074810.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilcrease-Tiger v. Welspun Pipes Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welspun Pipes Inc
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welspun USA Inc
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welspun Tubular LLC
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Kilcrease-Tiger
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Ann Koile
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?