Pounds v. K&M Capital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Pounds
Defendant: Kelly Joiner and K&M Capital LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00814
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage and to correct the description as follows, "ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kelly Joiner, K&M Capital LLC" as marked on the document. (cmn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/19/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/2/2020. Bench Trial set for 1/19/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 1/10/20. (mmb)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory James Northen on behalf of All Defendants (Northen, Gregory)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kelly Joiner, K&M Capital LLC.(Northen, Gregory) (Docket entry modified on 1/13/2020 to establish linkage and correct the description.)(cmn)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Defendants answer to the complaint is due on or before 5:00 PM, 1/10/2020. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/24/19. (mmb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Arthur Pounds (Sanford, Joshua)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Arthur Pounds. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT074882.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pounds v. K&M Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Joiner
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&M Capital LLC
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Pounds
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Tess Elizabeth Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?