Lopez et al v. YRC Inc et al
Plaintiff: Luciano Vela and Joaquin Lopez
Defendant: Arthur Johnson and YRC Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00818
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/10/2020 and Jury Trial set for 1/25/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/19/2019. (hml)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by YRC Inc (Comstock, Christina)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Arthur Johnson, YRC Inc.(Comstock, Christina)
December 17, 2019 Summons Reissued as to Arthur Johnson, YRC Inc. and returned to attorney for plaintiffs. (jap)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/04/2019. (pgt)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Roberto L. Ramirez. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3591420. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificatse of Good Standing)(Daniels, Shawn)
November 25, 2019 Summons Issued and returned to plaintiffs' counsel as to Arthur Johnson, YRC Inc. (jap)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Joaquin Lopez, Luciano Vela. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT074889.) No summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. YRC Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luciano Vela
Represented By: Shawn Bradley Daniels
Represented By: Roberto L. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Lopez
Represented By: Shawn Bradley Daniels
Represented By: Roberto L. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Johnson
Represented By: Christina D. Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Inc
Represented By: Christina D. Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?