Laury v. Juul Labs Inc et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Laury
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc, PAX Labs Inc, Altria Group Inc and Philip Morris USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00853
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Transfer Case Email. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 1/6/2020. (jak)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 E-MAIL received from U.S. District Court Northern District of California, confirming the case was received and opened in their district as case number 3:20-cv-00128. (jak)(Docket entry modified on 1/8/2020 to correct the file date) (jak)
January 6, 2020 Docket Note: Pursuant to #2 Conditional Transfer Order, this case was transferred to the U.S. District Court Northern District of California as part of MDL No. 2913 In Re: Juul Labs Inc., Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation on this date. (jak)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California as part of MDL No. 2913 In Re: Juul Labs Inc Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation.. Signed by John W. Nichols Clerk of the Panel. (jak)
December 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Juul Labs Inc, Philip Morris USA Inc. and returned to attorney for plaintiff. (jap)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Taylor Laury. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075028.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laury v. Juul Labs Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAX Labs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Laury
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Represented By: Emily Jeffcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?