Queder v. Uniti Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Phil Queder
Defendant: Mark A Wallace, Uniti Group Inc, Kenneth A Gunderman and Communications Sales & Leasing Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00873
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Phil Queder of Non-Opposition of Hallandale Beach Police and Firefighters Retirement Fund to Competing Motions for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel (McGaha, Corey)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead and Liaison Counsel by Phil Queder (Richardson, Scott)
December 31, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the proposed order was filed as an attachment to docket entry #3 in error. (cmn)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Phil Queder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Richardson, Scott)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Phil Queder. (Richardson, Scott)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead and Liaison Counsel by Phil Queder (Richardson, Scott)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion to Consolidate Cases of Hallandale Beach Police and Firefighters Retirement Fund for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel filed by Phil Queder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Corey McGaha) (McGaha, Corey) (Docket text modified on 12/31/2019 to indicate the proposed order was filed as an attachment in error.)(cmn)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases of Hallandale Beach Police and Firefighters Retirement Fund for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel by Phil Queder (McGaha, Corey)
December 9, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION". (thd)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Phil Queder. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075122. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Docket text modified on 12/9/2019 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Queder v. Uniti Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniti Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth A Gunderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Communications Sales & Leasing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Queder
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Peretz Bronstein
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Scott P. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?