Coastal Metal Works LLC v. Huffman Construction LLC et al
Plaintiff: Coastal Metal Works LLC
Defendant: Huffman Construction LLC and Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Case Number: 4:2019cv00875
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/13/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/27/2020. Proposed Bench Trial set sometime during the week of 2/16/2021 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Response to 12(B)(6) and Other Motions of Huffman Construction, LLC and Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland by Coastal Metal Works LLC (Cross, Junius)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Answer to Counterclaim by Coastal Metal Works LLC.(Cross, Junius)
January 14, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 and #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement. CORRECTION: The docket texts were modified to correct the filing parties as indicated on the documents. (kbc)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland.(Willis, Matthew)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Coastal Metal Works LLC by Huffman Construction LLC.(Willis, Matthew)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Willis, Matthew) Docket text modified on 1/14/2020 to correct filing party. (kbc)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Huffman Construction LLC (Willis, Matthew) Docket text modified on 1/14/2020 to correct filing party. (kbc)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to All Defendants; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to All Defendants until January 13, 2020. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/7/2020. (sjh)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants (Willis, Matthew)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer lacks an attorney's address, telephone number, Bar number, and email address (General Order 53) and does not contain a statement that the movant contacted the adverse party with regard to the motion (Local Rule 6.2(b)). (jak)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants (Willis, Matthew)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Wayne Willis on behalf of All Defendants (Willis, Matthew)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Miller Act Complaint Proof of Service - Summons and Complaint upon Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, filed by Coastal Metal Works LLC. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland served on 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cross, Junius)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Franklin Hoover on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoover, Joel)
December 9, 2019 Summons Reissued due to clerical error as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Coastal Metal Works LLC. (jbh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Coastal Metal Works LLC. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid; Receipt Number LIT075132.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coastal Metal Works LLC v. Huffman Construction LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huffman Construction LLC
Represented By: Matthew Wayne Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Matthew Wayne Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coastal Metal Works LLC
Represented By: Junius Bracy Cross
Represented By: Joel Franklin Hoover
Represented By: Junius Bracy Cross, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?