Pointer v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Marvin L Pointer
Defendant: Megan J Brennan and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 4:2019cv00898
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $400, receipt number LIT075764. (bmd)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 Plaintiff's pro se application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to pay the full filing fee within 30 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/27/2019. (ljb)
December 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct Defendant's name to be United States Postal Service. (thd)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, pursuant to General Order 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/13/2019. (ajt)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service filed by Marvin L Pointer.(ajt) (Docket text modified on 12/15/2019 to correct Defendant's name.)(thd).
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marvin L Pointer. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pointer v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin L Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?