Woods v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Bry'tsheona Woods
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00921
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bry'tsheona Woods. Social Security Administration served on 1/21/2020. (Long, Martin)
January 2, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (ljb)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without the prepayment of fees or costs or the giving of security. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to plaintiff, and plaintiff shall serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/2/2020. (ljb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Martin W. Long. (jbh)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Bry'tsheona Woods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bry'tsheona Woods. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bry'tsheona Woods
Represented By: Martin W. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?