Marlon Blackwell Architects PA v. HBG Design Inc et al
Plaintiff: Marlon Blackwell Architects PA
Defendant: HBG Design Inc, Saracen Development LLC and John Lane Berrey
Case Number: 4:2019cv00925
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Marlon Blackwell Architects PA. (Henry, Mark)
February 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald A. Hope on behalf of John Lane Berrey, Saracen Development LLC (Hope, Ronald)
February 7, 2020 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/6/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/20/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/8/2021 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/07/2020. (tmw)
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph E. Wilson, III on behalf of John Lane Berrey, Saracen Development LLC (Wilson, Ralph)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Saracen Development LLC. (Hope, Ronald)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Saracen Development LLC (Hope, Ronald)
February 6, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Lane Berrey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A. Declaration of John L. Berrey, Chairman, Business Committee, Quapaw Nation)(Hope, Ronald)
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Lane Berrey (Hope, Ronald)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HBG Design Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Jason)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by HBG Design Inc (Campbell, Jason)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by HBG Design Inc (Campbell, Jason)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason James Campbell on behalf of HBG Design Inc (Campbell, Jason)
January 20, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint and Notice to Preserve Evidence , filed by Marlon Blackwell Architects PA. John Lane Berrey served on 1/8/2020. (Henry, Mark)
January 20, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint and Notice to Preserve Evidence, filed by Marlon Blackwell Architects PA. HBG Design Inc served on 1/13/2020. (Henry, Mark)
January 20, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint and Notice to Preserve Evidence , filed by Marlon Blackwell Architects PA. Saracen Development LLC served on 1/16/2020. (Henry, Mark)
January 3, 2020 Summonses Issued as to John Lane Berrey, HBG Design Inc, Saracen Development LLC. and returned to counsel for plaintiff. (jap)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal regarding a Copyright submitted electronically by the Clerk's Office to the Register of Copyrights on 12/26/2019. (cdw)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Marlon Blackwell Architects PA. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075299.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marlon Blackwell Architects PA v. HBG Design Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBG Design Inc
Represented By: Jason James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saracen Development LLC
Represented By: Ronald A. Hope
Represented By: Ralph E. Wilson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lane Berrey
Represented By: Ronald A. Hope
Represented By: Ralph E. Wilson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Blackwell Architects PA
Represented By: Joseph Christopher Hall
Represented By: Jack East, III
Represented By: Mark Murphey Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?