Avery v. Uniti Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Michael Avery
Defendant: Mark A Wallace, Uniti Group Inc and Kenneth A Gunderman
Case Number: 4:2019cv00927
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Michael Fistel, Jr.. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3608444. Filed by Michael Avery (Gates, Joseph)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Frank J Johnson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3608437. Filed by Michael Avery (Gates, Joseph)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw #2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead and Liaison Counsel by Michael Avery (Richardson, Scott)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to 5 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/31/2019. (thd)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER Case transferred to Judge Miller. This case is related to 4:19-cv-00756-BSM and 4:19-cv-00873-BSM. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to Judge Miller. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/31/2019. (hml)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Michael Avery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Richardson, Scott)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Michael Avery. (Richardson, Scott)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead and Liaison Counsel by Michael Avery (Richardson, Scott)
December 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violations of Federal Securities Laws". (thd)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violations of Federal Securities Laws with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Michael Avery. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075312.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Docket text modified on 12/26/2019 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery v. Uniti Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Avery
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Frank J. Johnson
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Scott P. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniti Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth A Gunderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?