Stephens v. Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc
Plaintiff: Pamela Stephens
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00016
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/13/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/27/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/03/2020. (rmg)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand /Answer to Complaint by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc.(Lowther, Edwin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original civil cover sheet was not attached to the docket entry due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The civil cover sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Pamela Stephens with Jury Demand against Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. (bmd)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-8629. Fee $400 receipt number LIT075498. (bmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Stephens
Represented By: Jessica Virden Mallett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?