Melissa Gassaway v. Mentor Worldwide LLC et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Gassaway
Defendant: Analytic Biosurgical Solutions, Mentor Worldwide LLC, Coloplast Corp, Does 1 through 100, inclusive and Coloplast Manufacturing US LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00111
Filed: February 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 28 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-04253. Electronic file copy of case file, transfer order, and docket sheet received.
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES PURSUANT TO STIPULATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The parties' Stipulation to transfer each plaintiff's claim to the federal district court in the state where that plaintiff resides #26 is GRANTED. The claim of Plaintiff Teresa Drake is hereby transferred to the District of Idaho. The claim of Melissa Gassaway is hereby transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas. The claim of Linda Guntharp is hereby transferred to the Eastern District of Virginia. The claim of Pamela Hardin is hereby transferred to the Western District of Arkansas; The claim of Patricia Johnson is hereby transferred to the Northern District of Florida; The claim of Marguerite Juckett is hereby transferred to the Middle District of Florida. The claim of Denise Moore is hereby transferred to the Central District of Illinois; The claim of Aracely Parra is hereby transferred to the District of New Mexico; The claim of Ruth Tait is hereby transferred to the Western District of Texas; The claim of Bonna Urban is hereby transferred to the District of South Carolina. The claim of Jennifer West is hereby transferred to the Western District of North Carolina. Case electronically transferred to the Districts above. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Defendants Coloplast Corp, Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steimle, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Linda Guntharp, Pamela Hardin, Marguerite Juckett, Bonna Urban, Jennifer West filed by Defendants Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC., Coloplast Corp.(Steimle, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re-Setting Dates for Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Following the Order of the Chief Judge reassigning the matter to this Court #22 , the Court hereby re-sets the following dates: Final Pretrial Conference is rescheduled for 7/17/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Jury Trial is rescheduled for 8/4/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. All other scheduled dates in this matter will be adjusted to conform with this Court's rules. The Court ORDERS that the Parties jointly file a Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates worksheet, availing on Judge Birotte's website, by 1/31/2020. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#19-082) approved by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that the following cases be reassigned from the calendar of Judge Manuel L. Real to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr. for all further proceedings: The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04253 AB(RAOx). (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than June 5, 2020. (cch) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2020. Discovery cut-off 5/6/2020. Motions due by 5/20/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2020 at 09:00 AM. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (cch) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Counsel and parties are hereby notified that this matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on Monday, November 4, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable R. Gary Klausner in Courtroom 880 of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Counsel must be present and telephonic appearances are not permitted. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10-15 days per plaintiff, filed by Defendants Coloplast Corp, Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC... (Steimle, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for Failure to Comply With Court Order by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court ORDERS the parties to file an Early Meeting Report/Joint Rule 26(f) Report or the parties to show cause in writing on or before 10/3/2019 why this action should not be dismissed or the answer stricken for failure to comply with the Court's Order. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive filing on or before the date upon which a response by the parties is due. Failure to timely respond to the Court's Order may result in the imposition of sanctions which may dismissal of the action or the answer stricken. Court Reporter: None. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Honorable R. Gary Klausner, United States District Judge, will be handling this case pending reassignment. However, all appropriate oral and written communication shall continue to be directed to Christine Chung, Courtroom Deputy Clerk to Judge Real at 213-894-5696. Until reassignment of this case, counsel and parties shall continue to send mandatory chambers copies of all electronically filed documents, to courtroom 880 on the 8th Floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012, and send proposed orders to R_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 Pursuant to General Order 05-07, all discovery-related motions should be noticed for hearing before the assigned magistrate judge. Any pending discovery matters are hereby transferred to the assigned magistrate judge. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: The docket does not reflect leave of court to file an amended complaint. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Amend/Correct #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Coloplast Corp, Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC..(Steimle, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Analytic Biosurgical Solutions, Coloplast Corp, Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC., Does amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Denise Moore, Pamela Hardin, Aracely Parra, Bonna Urban, Linda Guntharp, Melissa Gassaway, Ruth Tait, Teresa Drake, Patricia Johnson, Jennifer West, Marguerite Juckett(Agnetti, Melissa) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Coloplast Corp, Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC..(Steimle, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/11/2019. See Order for details. (cch) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER RE: STIPULATION REGARDING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Manuel L. Real. Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint filed May 23, 2019, the parties stipulated to an amendment of the complaint with the complaint to be filed within fourteen days of the stipulation. Fourteen days have passed without plaintiffs filing any amended complaint. The time for filing plaintiffs' amended complaint pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, with the opposing party's written consent, has expired. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to AMEND filed by Defendants Coloplast Corp, Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC..(Steimle, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Coloplast Corp, Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC., identifying Coloplast A/S. (Steimle, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. without prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Denise Moore, Pamela Hardin, Aracely Parra, Bonna Urban, Linda Guntharp, Melissa Gassaway, Ruth Tait, Teresa Drake, Patricia Johnson, Jennifer West, Marguerite Juckett. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/16/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Analytic Biosurgical Solutions, Coloplast Corp, Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Mentor Worldwide LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Denise Moore, Pamela Hardin, Aracely Parra, Bonna Urban, Linda Guntharp, Melissa Gassaway, Ruth Tait, Teresa Drake, Patricia Johnson, Jennifer West, Marguerite Juckett. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/18/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Coloplast Corp, Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC.. (Steimle, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Barbara Superior Court, case number 18CV06194 Receipt No: 0973-23750963 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Coloplast Corp, Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William Edward Steimle added to party Coloplast Corp(pty:dft), Attorney William Edward Steimle added to party Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC.(pty:dft))(Steimle, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melissa Gassaway v. Mentor Worldwide LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Gassaway
Represented By: Melissa Anne Agnetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Analytic Biosurgical Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Worldwide LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coloplast Corp
Represented By: Donald F. Zimmer, Jr.
Represented By: William Edward Steimle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coloplast Manufacturing US LLC
Represented By: Donald F. Zimmer, Jr.
Represented By: William Edward Steimle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?