Barbee v. Holliday et al
Plaintiff: Sylvester O Barbee
Defendant: Doc Holliday, Brawley, Does Direct Supervision Management, Heath Service(s) Coordinator, Code(s) and Regualtion(s), Environmental Service(s) Coordinator, Admin. Shower Sanitation and Power Washing and Does Direct Supervision Management, Health Service(s) Coordinator, Code(s) and Regualtion(s), Environmental Service(s) Coordinator, Admin. Shower Sanitation and Power Washing
Case Number: 4:2020cv00123
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ajt)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT: Based on #11 Order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice, for failure to state a constitutional claim. I certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/26/2020. (ajt)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting #8 proposed findings and recommendations in all respects; dismissing without prejudice, Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendants, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from the Order and Judgment dismissing this action would not be taken in good faith. Dismissal of this action constitutes a "strike" within the meaning of the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA), 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/26/2020. (ajt)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Sylvester O Barbee. (llg)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sylvester O Barbee.(kdr)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #2 Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendants be DISMISSED without prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Dismissal of this action constitute a "strike" within the meaning of the Prison Litigation Reform Act. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from an Order and Judgment dismissing this action would not be taken in good faith. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/09/2020.
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Copies. The Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a copy of Document #2, including attachments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/27/20. (pdw)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Copies by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr)
February 11, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error (duplicate entry) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was previously filed as docket entry #4 Order. (jak)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (kdr) (Docket text modified on 2/11/2020 to indicate the document was filed in error)(jak)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 02/06/2020. (ajt)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's prison trust account, until a total of $350 has been collected and forwarded to the Clerk of the Court; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 Complaint form; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Varner Super Max Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/6/2020. (kdr)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Sylvester O Barbee. (llg)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sylvester O Barbee. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbee v. Holliday et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester O Barbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Direct Supervision Management, Heath Service(s) Coordinator, Code(s) and Regualtion(s), Environmental Service(s) Coordinator, Admin. Shower Sanitation and Power Washing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Direct Supervision Management, Health Service(s) Coordinator, Code(s) and Regualtion(s), Environmental Service(s) Coordinator, Admin. Shower Sanitation and Power Washing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?