Rack v. Schwartz et al
Plaintiff: Robert E Rack
Defendant: Woodland Hills HC Property Holdings LLC, John Does, Rosie Schwartz, CIBC Bank USA, Joseph Schwartz and CIBC Bank USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00135
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by CIBC Bank USA. (Baker, Adrienne)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by CIBC Bank USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B1, #3 Exhibit B2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Baker, Adrienne)
March 16, 2020 Summons Issued and given to attorney as to defendant CIBC Bank USA. (jap)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Does, Joseph Schwartz, Rosie Schwartz, Woodland Hills HC Property Holdings LLC, filed by Robert E Rack (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wilkes, James)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Defendant CIBC Bank USA's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, because Plaintiff has not responded and the time for doing so has passed. Accordingly, CIBC Bank USA is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/12/20. (dmm)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CIBC Bank USA Inc. (Baker, Adrienne)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CIBC Bank USA Inc (Baker, Adrienne)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Wilkes, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilkes, James)
February 12, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal and #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entries were modified to correct the file date as 2/07/2020 as marked on the documents. (jak)
February 11, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct Defendant's name to be "CIBC Bank USA Inc". (thd)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/16/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/30/2020. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 2/10/20. (mmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rack v. Schwartz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodland Hills HC Property Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBC Bank USA
Represented By: Adrienne L. Baker
Represented By: Stephen R. Lancaster
Represented By: Jeffrey Loel Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBC Bank USA Inc
Represented By: Adrienne L. Baker
Represented By: Stephen R. Lancaster
Represented By: Jeffrey Loel Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Rack
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Priebe
Represented By: Robert Henry Edwards
Represented By: James L. Wilkes, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?