Williams v. Arkansas Democrat-Gazette
Plaintiff: Frederick L Williams
Defendant: Arkansas Democrat-Gazette
Case Number: 4:2020cv00140
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of #5 Mr. Williams's filing and a copy of this Order to the Arkansas Workers' Compensation Commission. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/13/2020. (ajt)
March 13, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 MOTION for Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "NOTICE to the Court Requesting Supplementary Records filed by Frederick L Williams" pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to the Court Requesting Supplementary Records filed by Frederick L Williams. (fjg)(Docket text modified on 3/13/2020 to correct the description of the document filed pursuant to instruction from Chambers) (jak)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #3 Order filed on 02/19/2020, Plaintiff Frederick Williams's case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 02/19/2020. (ajt)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's case. #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP is moot. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 02/19/2020. (ajt)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Arkansas Democrat-Gazette filed by Frederick L Williams.(ajt)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frederick L Williams. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Arkansas Democrat-Gazette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Democrat-Gazette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?