PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc v. Rich Transport LLC et al
Plaintiff: PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc
Defendant: Rich Transport LLC and Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00150
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Central Division Office
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Keller, Thomas)
May 11, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc.(Buzbee, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Response to Motion,, filed by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc. (Buzbee, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript, #2 Exhibit Email from Shannon Everett, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Brief in Support, #5 Exhibit PKE's Response to Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit PKE's Brief in Support, #7 Exhibit Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Buzbee, John)
April 29, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Notice of Filing. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error, at the request of the filing party. (thd)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (Buzbee, John) (Docket text modified on 4/29/2020 at the request of the filing attorney.) (thd)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 Defendants' ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Keller, Thomas)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. (Keller, Thomas)
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Keller, Thomas)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christoph Keller on behalf of Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc (Keller, Thomas)
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tull, III on behalf of Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc (Tull, John)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/20/2020 and Bench Trial set for 7/19/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/28/2020. (hml)
April 24, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Answer to Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include a reference to the Counterclaim. (thd)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc.(thd)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 COUNTERCLAIM filed by by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc.(thd)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint and COUNTERClAIM by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc.(thd) (Docket text modified on 4/24/2020 to include a reference to the Counterclaim.) (thd).
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc.(thd)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by all Defendants from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-5626. (thd)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Reference in case number 4:20MC0001-LPR. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 USDC Docket Sheet for case 4:20MC0001-LPR, #2 USBC Docket Sheet for case 4:19AP01064)(thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc v. Rich Transport LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc
Represented By: John Blume Buzbee
Represented By: John R. Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Transport LLC
Represented By: Mary Tipton Thalheimer
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Treece
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc
Represented By: Mary Tipton Thalheimer
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Treece
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?