Wilson et al v. Santander Consumer USA Inc
Plaintiff: Ronne Dickerson, Devon Byrd, Betina Ingram and Frenzetta Wilson
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00152
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Devon Byrd, Ronne Dickerson, Frenzetta Wilson. (Lowther, Edwin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Devon Byrd, Ronne Dickerson, Frenzetta Wilson. (Lowther, Edwin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Croft, Blaec)
April 10, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Sitter on behalf of Santander Consumer USA Inc (Sitter, Benjamin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher Isaac deVyver on behalf of Santander Consumer USA Inc (deVyver, Kristopher)
April 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Betina Ingram (Lowther, Edwin)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 joint motion to modify briefing schedule on pending motions; and modifying the briefing schedule. Plaintiffs Frenzetta Wilson, Betina Ingram, Ronne Dickerson, and Devon Byrd, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, shall have up to and including 4/10/2020, to respond to the #6 motion to transfer case, #9 motion to compel arbitration, and #12 motion to dismiss. Santander shall have up to and including 4/29/2020, to reply to plaintiffs' responses. Santander shall have up to and including 4/10/2020, to respond to #14 plaintiffs' motion to remand. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including 4/29/2020, to reply to Santander's response. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/17/2020. (jbh)
March 17, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Santander Consumer USA Inc (Croft, Blaec)
March 12, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lowther, Edwin)
March 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs (Lowther, Edwin)
March 11, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Croft, Blaec)
March 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Santander Consumer USA Inc (Croft, Blaec)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Randy Bockenstedt by Santander Consumer USA Inc. re #9 Motion to Compel filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Croft, Blaec)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities re #9 Motion to Compel filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Croft, Blaec)
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Plaintiff Betina Ingram's Claim by Santander Consumer USA Inc (Croft, Blaec)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION Randy Bockenstedt by Santander Consumer USA Inc. re #7 Memorandum, #6 Transfer Case filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Croft, Blaec)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Croft, Blaec)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Santander Consumer USA Inc (Croft, Blaec)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Motion lack an original signature (F.R.Cv.P 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 motion to extend time to respond to plaintiffs' initial complaint. Santander has up to, and including, 3/13/2020, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/18/2020. (jbh)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to extend time to respond to Plaintiff's initial Complaint by Santander Consumer USA Inc. (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 2/19/2020)) (jak).
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Santander Consumer USA Inc, filed by All Plaintiffs. (jbh)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Santander Consumer USA Inc from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 35CV-20-00043. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT076065. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct (submitted 2/19/2020)) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Santander Consumer USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronne Dickerson
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Represented By: Randall Keith Pulliam
Represented By: Cassandra J. DeCoursey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Byrd
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Represented By: Randall Keith Pulliam
Represented By: Cassandra J. DeCoursey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betina Ingram
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Represented By: Randall Keith Pulliam
Represented By: Cassandra J. DeCoursey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frenzetta Wilson
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Represented By: Randall Keith Pulliam
Represented By: Cassandra J. DeCoursey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc
Represented By: Blaec C. Croft
Represented By: Kristopher Isaac deVyver
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?