Tree of Life Seeds Inc v. Island Consulting Inc
Plaintiff: Tree of Life Seeds Inc
Defendant: Island Consulting Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00154
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint (Counterclaim) by Tree of Life Seeds Inc.(McNulty, Kelly)
February 22, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the Counterclaim was filed against Plaintiff Tree of Life Seeds Inc. (thd)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Tree of Life Seeds Inc by Island Consulting Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Industrial Hemp Seed License Agreement)(Baker, Adrienne) (Docket text modified on 2/22/2020 to indicate the counterclaim is filed against Plaintiff.) (thd).
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Island Consulting Inc filed by Tree of Life Seeds Inc.(ajt)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Island Consulting Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number CV60-20-483. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT076068. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tree of Life Seeds Inc v. Island Consulting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tree of Life Seeds Inc
Represented By: Kelly Wayne McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Consulting Inc
Represented By: Jacob Post Fair
Represented By: Adrienne L. Baker
Represented By: Erika Ross Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?