Wolfe et al v. Affordable Rooter Service LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steve Nicholas and Tyler Wolfe
Defendant: Brent Bogan and Affordable Rooter Service LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00156
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Nicholas. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service - Brent Bogan)(Hamlet, Lydia)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/1/2020 and Jury Trial set for 5/17/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/11/2020. (hml)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Affordable Rooter Service LLC (Wakefield, Samuel)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Affordable Rooter Service LLC, Brent Bogan.(Wakefield, Samuel)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Brent Wakefield on behalf of Affordable Rooter Service LLC, Brent Bogan (Wakefield, Samuel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tyler Wolfe, Steve Nicholas. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076071.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe et al v. Affordable Rooter Service LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Bogan
Represented By: Samuel Brent Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable Rooter Service LLC
Represented By: Samuel Brent Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Nicholas
Represented By: Lydia Hicks Hamlet
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Wolfe
Represented By: Lydia Hicks Hamlet
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?